This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2021 at 09:37:14 (UTC).

Trinity Health Corporation v. Devon MD, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Trinity Health Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Devon MD, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David R. Grand and Stephanie Dawkins Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-10788

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

Presiding Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trinity Health Corporation

Defendant

Devon MD, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Clark

Attorney at Honigman LLP

2290 First National Building, 660 Woodward Ave

Detroit, MI 48226

Michael P. Hindelang

Attorney at Honigman LLP

660 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2290

Detroit, MI 48226-3506

Defendant Attorney

A. Michael Palizzi

Attorney at Miller, Canfield,

150 W. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs Complaint Reply Brief in Support of Motion filed by Devon MD, LLC. (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Trinity Health Corporation. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs Complaint by All Defendants. (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Defendant Devon MD's Answer to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Regarding Devin MD's Answer to Complaint by Trinity Health Corporation and by Devon MD, LLC (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Clark on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Hindelang on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Hindelang, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Devon MD, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 21-002738-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8417688 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEVON MD, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Trinity Health Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Hindelang