This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:46:07 (UTC).

TRINH v. PETERSON et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 TRINH filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against PETERSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY D LAND and STEPHEN HYLES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

Referral Judge

STEPHEN HYLES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAI TRINH

Lumpkin, GA 31815

Respondents

Warden CHARLIE PETERSON

SEAN GALLAGHER

KIRSTJEN NIELSON

Not Yet Classified

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BERNARD SNELL

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Po Box 1702

Macon, GA 31202-1702

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-25-19. (jdl) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HAI TRINH. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-20-19. (bdd) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT in favor of CHARLIE PETERSON, KIRSTJEN NIELSON, SEAN GALLAGHER against HAI TRINH (esl) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss; adopting #8 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/18/2019 (esl) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JUDGMENT in favor of CHARLIE PETERSON, KIRSTJEN NIELSON, SEAN GALLAGHER against HAI TRINH (esl) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss; adopting #8 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/18/2019 (esl) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail Returned as undeliverable - #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by KIRSTJEN NIELSON, CHARLIE PETERSON, SEAN GALLAGHER, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HAI TRINH (esl) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by KIRSTJEN NIELSON, CHARLIE PETERSON, SEAN GALLAGHER, and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HAI TRINH. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-26-19. (bdd) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by SEAN GALLAGHER, KIRSTJEN NIELSON, CHARLIE PETERSON filed by BERNARD SNELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warrant of Removal/Deportation, Form I-205). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(SNELL, BERNARD) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-25-19. (jdl) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SEAN GALLAGHER, KIRSTJEN NIELSON, CHARLIE PETERSON (SNELL, BERNARD) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HAI TRINH. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-20-19. (bdd) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HAI TRINH (tlf). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by HAI TRINH. Filing fee $ 5.00, Receipt number 42159 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.