This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2020 at 07:39:53 (UTC).

Trine v. Guardian Home Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Trine filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Guardian Home Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karin J. Immergut. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karin J. Immergut

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Amy Trine

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care

Guardian Home Care, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Stephanie J. Brown

Attorney at Schuck Law, LLC

208 E 25Th Street

Vancouver, WA 98663

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Anthony Copple

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

200 Sw Market St., Ste. 540

Portland, OR 97201

Scott Oberg Oborne

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Sw Market Street, Suite 540

Portland, OR 97201

Scott William Oborne

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Sw Market Street, Suite 540

Portland, OR 97201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , Counterclaim Amy Trine. Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc.. (Oborne, Scott) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/14/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/15/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (sss) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) Answer to #5 Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim . Filed by Amy Trine. (Brown, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv48434 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6150734 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1). (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint Status Report and Proposed Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Defendants. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint Status Report and Proposed Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Defendants. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to #5 Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim . Filed by Amy Trine. (Brown, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , Counterclaim Amy Trine. Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc.. (Oborne, Scott) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/14/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/15/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (sss) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv48434 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6150734 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1). (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less