This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:42:39 (UTC).

TriDiNetworks Ltd. v. Signify North America Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 TriDiNetworks Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Signify North America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01063

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TriDiNetworks Ltd.

Defendants

Signify Netherlands B.V.

Signify North America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Finger

Attorney at Finger & Slanina LLC

One Commerce Center, 1201 North Orange Street, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801-1186

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Jeremy P. Oczek

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Signify North America Corporation and Signify Netherlands B.V. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 1, 2019 - filed by Signify Netherlands B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by TriDiNetworks Ltd.. (Finger, David) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy P. Oczek - filed by Signify North America Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Signify North America Corporation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 2, 2019 - filed by Signify North America Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TriDiNetworks Ltd.. Signify North America Corporation served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Finger, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,437,276 B2. (ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Signify Netherlands B.V., Signify North America Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2660315.) - filed by TriDiNetworks Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Signify North America Corporation and Signify Netherlands B.V. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 1, 2019 filed by Signify Netherlands B.V., Signify North America Corporation. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Signify Netherlands B.V. answer due 10/1/2019; Signify North America Corporation answer due 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/23/2019. (fms) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Signify North America Corporation and Signify Netherlands B.V. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 1, 2019 - filed by Signify Netherlands B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Signify Netherlands B.V. (nmg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by TriDiNetworks Ltd.. (Finger, David) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeremy P. Oczek for Signify North America Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy P. Oczek filed by Signify North America Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/28/2019. (nmf) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy P. Oczek - filed by Signify North America Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Signify North America Corporation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 2, 2019 filed by Signify North America Corporation. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Signify North America Corporation answer due 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/25/2019. (fms) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Signify North America Corporation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 2, 2019 - filed by Signify North America Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TriDiNetworks Ltd.. Signify North America Corporation served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Finger, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01062-CFC, 1:19-cv-01063-CFC, 1:19-cv-01064-CFC(nmg) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Signify Netherlands B.V. on 6/7/2019; Signify North America Corporation on 6/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,437,276 B2. (ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Signify Netherlands B.V., Signify North America Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2660315.) - filed by TriDiNetworks Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.