This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2019 at 07:53:08 (UTC).

Trident Brands, Inc. v. Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Trident Brands, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00510

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trident Brands, Inc.

200 South Executive Drive

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendants

International Brand Management Limited

Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corp.

Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Bret I. Herman

Attorney at Schlacter & Associates

450 Seventh Avenue - Suite 1308

New York, NY 10123

Jed Richard Schlacter

Attorney at Schlacter & Associates

450 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10123

Other Attorneys

Neal F. Kronley

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

James C. Bookhout

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1900 North Pearl Street, Ste 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert Myers Hoffman, I

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1900 North Pearl Street, Ste 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael D. Hynes

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (NY)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Cary Brian Samowitz

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (NY)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

27 #2

Proposed Order

27 #1

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#27

(#27) MOTION for Robert Myers Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16461144. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#25

(#25) MOTION for James Clark Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bookhout, James) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for James C. Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16419809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bookhout, James) Modified on 2/28/2019 (bcu). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#23

(#23) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Hynes as counsel and to terminate Docket No. 20. Granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael D. Hynes terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/28/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#22

(#22) DECLARATION of Robert M. Hoffman in Support re: #14 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H)(Samowitz, Cary) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

20 #2

Certificate of Service

20 #1

Declaration in Support of Notice of Withdrawal

#20

(#23) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Hynes as counsel and to terminate Docket No. 20. Granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael D. Hynes terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/28/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sports Direct International PLC for Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corp., International Brand Management Limited. Document filed by Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corp., International Brand Management Limited.(Herman, Bret) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Herman, Bret) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Complaint in case no 19-cv-503

1 #1

Exhibit 1- All State Court pleadings

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bret I. Herman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to a typographical error, the name of one of the filers is incorrect on the docket entry text; the Notice of Removal was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Robert Myers Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Robert Myers Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16461144. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Robert Myers Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16461144. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for James Clark Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for James Clark Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for James Clark Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bookhout, James) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for James C. Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16419809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. We do not except them from a state bar registration.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for James C. Bookhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16419809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bookhout, James) Modified on 2/28/2019 (bcu). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Hynes as counsel and to terminate Docket No. 20. Granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael D. Hynes terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/28/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DECLARATION of Robert M. Hoffman in Support re: #14 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Trident Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H)(Samowitz, Cary) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bret I. Herman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand $76,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bret I. Herman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bret I. Herman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to a typographical error, the name of one of the filers is incorrect on the docket entry text; the Notice of Removal was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 19cv00503. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Bret I. Herman, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sports Direct International PLC for Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corp., International Brand Management Limited. Document filed by Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corp., International Brand Management Limited.(Herman, Bret) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Herman, Bret) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650216/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16207120).Document filed by Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corp., International Brand Management Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- All State Court pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2- Complaint in case no 19-cv-503, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Herman, Bret) Modified on 1/18/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everlast World's Boxing Headquarters Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cary Brian Samowitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Hynes Esq.