This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:20:13 (UTC).

Tribal Behavioral Health LLC et al v. Reeves et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Tribal Behavioral Health LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Reeves. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Tribal Behavioral Health LLC

Tribal Health LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

John R Reeves, III

Pui Reeves

Unknown Parties

John Shufeldt

Defendant and Cross Defendant

John Shufeldt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Paul Joseph Roshka, Jr.

Attorney at Jennings Haug Keleher McLeod

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1049

Alana Lynn Porrazzo

Attorney at Jennings Haug Keleher McLeod LLP

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Joseph Andrew Brophy

Attorney at Jennings Haug Keleher McLeod LLP

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Bradley W Petersen

Attorney at Slattery Petersen PC - Phoenix, AZ

340 E Palm Lane, Ste. 250

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Dana Delman

Attorney at Delman Vukmanovic LLP

19200 Von Karman Ave., 6Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Gabriel Taft Oquin

Attorney at Slattery Petersen PC - Phoenix, AZ

340 E Palm Lane, Ste. 250

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John Vukmanovic

Attorney at Delman Vukmanovic LLP

19200 Von Karman Ave., 6Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) REPLY to #26 Counterclaim by John Shufeldt, Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC.(Brophy, Joseph) *Modified text and added filer on 7/18/2022 (WLP). (Entered: 07/13/2022)

29 #1

Rule 16 Case Management Order

29 #29

Main Document

#28

(#28) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by John Shufeldt, Tribal Behavioral Health LLC. (Brophy, Joseph) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#27

(#27) ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) is granted in part and as modified to the extent Plaintiffs request a preliminary injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court enters a preliminary injunction as follows: 1. Defendant, or any persons or entities acting in concert with or on his behalf, shall identify and sequester any and all business information, records, or documents in his or their possession containing Plaintiffs' "Confidential Information" as that term is defined in the parties' Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Agreement. This includes the Via Healthcare Consulting Report, TBH and Tribal Health customer lists or files, and proprietary marketing plans and/or pricing data. 2. Defendant, or any persons or entities acting in concert with or on his behalf, shall be enjoined from using, referring to, or divulging TBH and Tribal Health business information, records, or documents containing Confidential Information or violating any provision of his Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Agreement. 3. Defendant shall return to TBH and Tribal Health any and all Confidential Information that remains in Defendant's or his agent(s)' possession, custody, or control. 4. Defendant, or any persons or entities acting in concert with or on his behalf, shall be enjoined from soliciting or initiating any contact with any TBH or Tribal Health clients and confidential prospective customer leads, with the exception of the Elk Valley Rancheria Tribe. Defendant is not enjoined from soliciting, initiating contact with, or otherwise pursuing projects with representatives of the Elk Valley tribe, Del Norte County Supervisors, or any other person or entity in furtherance of developing behavioral health services on or around Elk Valley tribal lands. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/24/2022. (WLP) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#26

(#26) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC, John Shufeldt by Pui Reeves, John R Reeves, III.(Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE re: Notice of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC . (Brophy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

22 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Consulting Services Agreement

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W Petersen on behalf of John R Reeves, III, Pui Reeves. (Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC. (Roshka, Paul) (MCO) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

2 #2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY to #26 Counterclaim by John Shufeldt, Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC.(Brophy, Joseph) *Modified text and added filer on 7/18/2022 (WLP). (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 03:30 PM, in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. The parties shall jointly develop and file with the Clerk of Court no later than 8/12/2022: (1) a Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report, and (2) a Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Rule 16 Case Management Order) (RMW) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by John Shufeldt, Tribal Behavioral Health LLC. (Brophy, Joseph) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) is granted in part and as modified to the extent Plaintiffs request a preliminary injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court enters a preliminary injunction as follows: 1. Defendant, or any persons or entities acting in concert with or on his behalf, shall identify and sequester any and all business information, records, or documents in his or their possession containing Plaintiffs' "Confidential Information" as that term is defined in the parties' Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Agreement. This includes the Via Healthcare Consulting Report, TBH and Tribal Health customer lists or files, and proprietary marketing plans and/or pricing data. 2. Defendant, or any persons or entities acting in concert with or on his behalf, shall be enjoined from using, referring to, or divulging TBH and Tribal Health business information, records, or documents containing Confidential Information or violating any provision of his Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Agreement. 3. Defendant shall return to TBH and Tribal Health any and all Confidential Information that remains in Defendant's or his agent(s)' possession, custody, or control. 4. Defendant, or any persons or entities acting in concert with or on his behalf, shall be enjoined from soliciting or initiating any contact with any TBH or Tribal Health clients and confidential prospective customer leads, with the exception of the Elk Valley Rancheria Tribe. Defendant is not enjoined from soliciting, initiating contact with, or otherwise pursuing projects with representatives of the Elk Valley tribe, Del Norte County Supervisors, or any other person or entity in furtherance of developing behavioral health services on or around Elk Valley tribal lands. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/24/2022. (WLP) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC, John Shufeldt by Pui Reeves, John R Reeves, III.(Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE re: Notice of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC . (Brophy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 Notice (Other) filed by John R Reeves, III, Pui Reeves, #21 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by John R Reeves, III, Pui Reeves. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Dana Delman but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Bradley Petersen. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Steven P Logan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/14/2022. Evidence presented. 2:42 pm Court stands in recess. 3:11 pm Court resumes. Same parties present. Argument heard. Plaintiffs shall submit the requested "lead list" to the Court no later than 5:00 pm on June 15, 2022 for an in camera review. Defense counsel shall file the Consulting Services Agreement by noon on June 15, 2022. The Court takes the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) under advisement. APPEARANCES: Alan Porrazzo and Paul Roshka, Jr. for Plaintiff. Gabriel Oquin and Dana Delman (appearing telephonically) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 1:28 pm to 3:35 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MJF) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE re: NOTICE OF FILING CONSULTING SERVICES AGREEMENT by John R Reeves, III, Pui Reeves . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consulting Services Agreement)(Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W Petersen on behalf of John R Reeves, III, Pui Reeves. (Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Paul J. Roshka re: #9 Order,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, by Plaintiffs Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC. (Roshka, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied. No later than close of business on 6/1/2022, Plaintiffs must serve a copy on Defendants and file proof of service with the Court of the following: (1) the Complaint; (2) the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and attachments; and (3) this Order. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 6/14/2022 at 1:30 PM, before the Honorable Judge Steven P. Logan, Courtroom 501. Defendants shall have until 6/7/2022 to file any Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiffs shall have until 6/9/2022 to file any Reply in support of their Motion. The parties shall file a Joint Notice by 6/3/2022, indicating whether the motion may be decided on the briefing and argument of counsel alone. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed form of preliminary injunction no later than 6/7/2022. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/31/2022. (RMW) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 8/25/2022. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court and, unless the Court orders otherwise, on 8/25/2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/31/22. (RMW) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Tribal Health LLC. (MCO) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to John R Reeves, III, Pui Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20712441. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-926-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Submitted by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC. (Roshka, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC. (Roshka, Paul) (MCO) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC. (Roshka, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(MCO). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 5/31/2022 per chambers (RMW). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20712441 filed by Tribal Behavioral Health LLC, Tribal Health LLC. (Roshka, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley W Petersen(Designation Retained)