This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:04:16 (UTC).

Tri-City Healthcare District v. Humana, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Tri-City Healthcare District filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Humana, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara Lynn Major and Barry Ted Moskowitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00877

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara Lynn Major

Presiding Judge

Barry Ted Moskowitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tri-City Healthcare District doing business as Tri-City Medical Center

Defendants

Humana, Inc.

Does 1 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David F. Mastan

Joy Stephenson-Laws

Jennifer Jiao

Richard A. Lovich

Defendant Attorneys

Norvik Azarian

Ronald Keith Alberts

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Re Complaint Exhibit by Humana, Inc.. (Alberts, Ronald) (sjt). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Re Complaint Attached to RKA Declaration by Humana, Inc.. (Alberts, Ronald) (sjt). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/23/2022. (sjt) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE BY DEFENDANTS CONFIRMING NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL by Humana, Inc. (Alberts, Ronald) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Jiao and Attorney Information by Jennifer Jiao on behalf of Tri-City Healthcare District (Jiao, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Jiao added to party Tri-City Healthcare District(pty:pla) (sjt). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Humana, Inc..(Alberts, Ronald) (sjt). (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/9/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/5/2022.(sjt) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) MOTION for Protective Order by Humana, Inc. (Alberts, Ronald) (tcf). (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#12

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER Granting #11 Joint Motion for Protective Order with Modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/10/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 3/7/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major via videoconference. If the trial will be a bench trial, Counsel shall file their Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law by 10/18/2023. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 11/8/2023. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/15/2023 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/10/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 3/7/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major via videoconference. If the trial will be a bench trial, Counsel shall file their Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law by 10/18/2023. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 11/8/2023. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/15/2023 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/10/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER Granting #11 Joint Motion for Protective Order with Modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/10/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: (Z) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/9/2022. Case did not settle. (Z) Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2022. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Jennifer Jiao). (Defendant Attorney Ronald Keith Alberts). (no document attached) (afv) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Tri-City Healthcare District (Jiao, Jennifer) (tcf). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for Protective Order by Humana, Inc. (Alberts, Ronald) (tcf). (Entered: 08/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Tri-City Healthcare District (Jiao, Jennifer)(sjt). (Entered: 07/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/9/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/5/2022.(sjt) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Humana, Inc..(Alberts, Ronald) (sjt). (Entered: 07/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Jiao and Attorney Information by Jennifer Jiao on behalf of Tri-City Healthcare District (Jiao, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Jiao added to party Tri-City Healthcare District(pty:pla) (sjt). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE BY DEFENDANTS CONFIRMING NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL by Humana, Inc. (Alberts, Ronald) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/23/2022. (sjt) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Re Complaint Attached to RKA Declaration by Humana, Inc.. (Alberts, Ronald) (sjt). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Re Complaint Exhibit by Humana, Inc.. (Alberts, Ronald) (sjt). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22-cv-00877-BTM-BLM.(no document attached) (ddf) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16916767.), filed by Humana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:22-cv-877-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(alns) (jms). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less