This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2021 at 16:54:07 (UTC).

Trex Properties LLC v. 25th Street Holding Company Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Trex Properties LLC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against 25th Street Holding Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Conrad, Jr and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00458

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Conrad, Jr

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trex Properties LLC

Defendants

25TH STREET HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

3V SIGMA USA INC.

5 STAR AUTO COLLISION, INC.

A-1 AUTO BODY

A-1 BODY SHOP, LLC.

A. BERGER, INC.

A&P COLLISION, INC.

A1 AUTO BODY & PAINTING

A1 AUTOMOTIVE INC.

ABC LIQUORS, INC.

ABINGDON CLEANERS & LAUNDERERS, INC.

ACCUMETRICS LIMITED

ACCURATE ANGLES, INC.

ACCURATE FORMING, LLC

ACE PAINT & BODY WORKS, INC.

ACUTECH MOTORS, INC.

ADAMS AUTO SALES & BODY SHOP, LLC

ADC FINISHING, INC.

ADMARK GRAPHIC SYSTEMS, LLC

921 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Merryman

4100 Terrace St.

Kansas City, MO 64111

Stanley Boyd Green

Attorney at Strauch Green & Mistretta, P.C.

1752 Heritage Center Drive, Suite 101

Wake Forest, NC 27587

Rachel D. Guthrie

Attorney at The Justis Law Firm

4100 Terrace St.

Kansas City, MO 64111

Other Attorneys

Zephyr Jost Sullivan

Attorney at McAngus, Goudelock and Courie

10 Brook Street

Asheville, NC 28803

Peter V. Keays

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller

One Logan Square, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Steven T. Miano

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller

One Logan Square, Ste 27Th Floor

Pennsylvania, PA 19103

Deborah Nobling Greene

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

P.O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602

Michael Elmer Bulleri

Attorney at NC DOJ

114 W. Edenton Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

James Benjamin Trachtman

Attorney at North Carolina Department of Justice

114 W. Edenton Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

John Cane

Attorney at DOJ-Enrd

150 M Street, Ne, Room 4.1131

Washington, DC 20002

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#339) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Regions Financial Corporation with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#338) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Premiere Fibers, LLC with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#337) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Filtrair, Inc. with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#336) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Electric Power Research Institute, Inc. with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#335) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant The Carlyle Group, Inc. with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#334) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Bethune Nonwovens, Inc. with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#333) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Wall Colmonoy Corporation with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#332) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant York Body Shop, LLC with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#331) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Maaco Collision Repair & Auto Painting (Lynchburg) with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#330) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Mack Brown, Inc. with Prejudice by Trex Properties LLC (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
330 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of the Air Force, United States Food & Drug Administration, United States Geological Survey, United States Navy, United States Postal Service, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(js) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on September 14, 2021 by Trex Properties LLC. (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice to Rachel D. Guthrie: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/9/2021. (mek) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice to Matthew T. Merryman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/9/2021. (mek) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew T. Merryman for Trex Properties LLC; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Rachel D. Guthrie for Trex Properties LLC, (Pro Hac Vice Attorneys served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/2/2021. (mek) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rachel D. Guthrie Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5199665. by Trex Properties LLC. (Green, Stanley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew T. Merryman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5199636. by Trex Properties LLC. (Green, Stanley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trex Properties LLC (Green, Stanley) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5191348), filed by Trex Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Green, Stanley) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC LIQUORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES B. TRACHTMAN