This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 08:13:53 (UTC).

Trent v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Trent filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06217

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lamont Trent

Defendants

City Of Chicago

Ryan Galiardo

Khaled Hasan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth N Flaxman

Attorney at Kenneth N. Flaxman, P.C.

200 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 201

Chicago, IL 60604-6107

Joel A. Flaxman

Attorney at Kenneth N. Flaxman P.C.

200 S Michigan Ave Ste 201

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Raoul Vertick Mowatt

Attorney at City of Chicago Department of Law

2 N. Lasalle St., Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Lavang Zehawi

Attorney at City Of Chicago Department Of Law

2 N. Lasalle St., Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Emily Rachel Bammel

Attorney at City Of Chicago - Dept. Of Law, Federal Civil Rights Litigat

2 N. Lasalle St. Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Jessica L Griff

Attorney at City Of Chicago Department Of Law

2 N. Lasalle St., Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford

Attorney at City Of Chicago

2 N. Lasalle St., Ste. 420

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendants' second unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint on or before 1/19/2021 #13 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION by Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan for extension of time to file answer for ALL named Defendants (UNOPPOSED) (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan by Jessica L Griff (Griff, Jessica) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan by Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford (Hanford, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Lavang Zehawi (Zehawi, Lavang) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Emily Rachel Bammel of Change of Address for Defendant Officers' Attorney (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for extension of time to and including 12/18/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer (unopposed) (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan by Emily Rachel Bammel (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lamont Trent by Kenneth N Flaxman (Flaxman, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lamont Trent by Joel A. Flaxman (Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lamont Trent; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17560458.(Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendants' second unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint on or before 1/19/2021 #13 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan for extension of time to file answer for ALL named Defendants (UNOPPOSED) (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan by Jessica L Griff (Griff, Jessica) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan by Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford (Hanford, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Lavang Zehawi (Zehawi, Lavang) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Emily Rachel Bammel of Change of Address for Defendant Officers' Attorney (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for extension of time to and including 12/18/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer (unopposed) (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan by Emily Rachel Bammel (Bammel, Emily) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Ryan Galiardo, Khaled Hasan (cm, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lamont Trent by Kenneth N Flaxman (Flaxman, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lamont Trent by Joel A. Flaxman (Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lamont Trent; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17560458.(Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Rachel Bammel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lavang Zehawi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Griff