This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:27:33 (UTC).

Trenkle v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Trenkle filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Trenkle

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Basil E. Adham

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Clint Reed

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Ave., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16535792 filed by Angel Trenkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21002 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01018. File received electronically (Entered: 03/17/2022)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth))(originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth)

#9

(#9) JOINT STATEMENT regarding venue and division (originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER with directions to the Clerk to open a civil case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/10/2022. (originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT - Transferred case has been opened in the United States District Court for the District of Montana as case 9:22-cv-60, filed on 3/17/22. (LRB) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#11) TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the District of Montana, case transferred electronically. (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER with directions to the Clerk to open a civil case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/10/2022. (originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STATEMENT regarding venue and division (originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth))(originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01018. File received electronically (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21002 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01018-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16535792 filed by Angel Trenkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina R. Gallo