This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2020 at 11:49:05 (UTC).

Trendsettah USA, Inc. et al v. Swisher International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Trendsettah USA, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Swisher International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia G. Cooke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-21049

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trend Settah, Inc.

Trendsettah USA, Inc.

Defendant

Swisher International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Roman

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Three Brickell City Centre, 98 Southeast Seventh Street, Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131-1714

Michael Constantine Marsh

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Suite 1100, Three Brickell City Centre, 98

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Order Lifting Stay

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Order Denying Petition

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. re #5 Notice (Other) of Filing Order Lifting Stay in the Underlying Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Order Denying Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Order Lifting Stay) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Stay Order in the Underlying Action

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. of Filing Order Staying the Underlying Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Stay Order in the Underlying Action) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. re #3 Notice (Other) of Filing Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Certificate of Service) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, (Notice of Filing Declaration of Service) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Service) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #14

Exhibit K

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Affidavit (Declaration of Minae Yu)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. re #5 Notice (Other) of Filing Order Lifting Stay in the Underlying Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Order Denying Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Order Lifting Stay) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. of Filing Order Staying the Underlying Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Stay Order in the Underlying Action) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. re #3 Notice (Other) of Filing Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Certificate of Service) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Swisher International, Inc. re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, (Notice of Filing Declaration of Service) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Service) (Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. (cds) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District . Filing fee $47.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12576621, filed by Swisher International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Affidavit (Declaration of Minae Yu), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Roman, Ryan) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less