This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 08:24:55 (UTC).

Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-06313

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trenchant Blade Technologies, LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co Ltd

Samsung Electronics America Inc

Samsung Semiconductor Inc

Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley David Liddle

Douglas Quinton Hahn

E. Leon Carter

Minghui Yang

Nathan I. Cox

Seth Adam Lindner

Scott W. Breedlove

Defendant Attorney

Michael E. Jones

 

Court Documents

#34

33 #1

Proposed Order

#33

#32

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#4

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (64) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:20-cv-08205-VC; (33) in case 3:21-cv-06313-VC. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay Cases filed by Trenchant Blade Technologies, LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hahn, Douglas) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Trenchant Blade Technologies, LLC.. (Hahn, Douglas) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#31) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2021.Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, October 21st, 2021, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.> /p> (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (bxsS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Case Reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/31/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by August 31, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of California. (ir) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. National Registered Agents, Inc. c/o Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. CT Corporation System c/o Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14407322), filed by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Breedlove, Scott) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2021) (lad). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less