This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:57:37 (UTC).

TRELLA v. AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 TRELLA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05024

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

THOMAS TRELLA

LUCILLE TRELLA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.

CBS CORPORATION

GOULDS PUMPS, LLC

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORP.

JOHN CRANE INC.

LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP.

MORGAN ENGINEERING

REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC

VIKING PUMP, INC,

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

AJAX MANUFACTURING COMPANY CORPORATION SERVICE CO.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.

VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION

WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.

COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION

THOMAS TRELLA

LUCILLE TRELLA

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren Linsenbach

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos, PC

2001 N. Front St.

Ste Bldg 3, SU 330

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

CATHERINE N. JASONS

Attorney at KELLEY JASONS MCGUIRE SPINELLI HANNA LLP

1818 Market Street, Suite 3205

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOHN P. MCSHEA

Attorney at MCSHEA LAW FIRM PC

1500 Market St Suite 4000

Philadelphia, PA 19102

AARON ARTHUR

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TIFFANY F. TURNER

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

1650 Arch Street, Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

WILLIAM R. ADAMS

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

1650 Arch St Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

W. MATTHEW REBER

Attorney at KELLEY JASON MCGUIRE & SPINELLI & HANNA

Two Liberty Place, Suite 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

MICHAEL J. BLOCK

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

1818 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3631

JOHN S. HOWARTH

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

1818 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3631

MOLLY C. REILLY

Attorney at REILLY JANICZEK & MCDEVITT, PC

Widener Building, One South Penn Square, Ste. 410

Philadelphia, PA 19107

LEAH A. LEWIS

Attorney at REILLY JANICZEK & MCDEVITT

One S Penn Square, Widener Bldg Suite 410

Philadelphia, PA 19107

SUSAN M. VALINIS

Attorney at REILLY JANICZEK & MCDEVITT P.C.

Widener Building, Suite 410, One South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

ADAM A. DESIPIO

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

CORY C. SIDELSKY

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1650 Market Street, Suite 5000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Lauren Linsenbach

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos, PC

2001 N. Front St.

Ste Bldg 3, SU 330

Other Attorneys

G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL, LLC

One Liberty Place 38Th Floor, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PETER J. NEESON

Attorney at RAWLE & HENDERSON LLP

The Widener Bldg, One South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

JOSEPH I FONTAK

Attorney at LEADER & BERKON LLP

1515 Market St Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

DAMIAN JACKSON

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

ALAN R. GRIES

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

One Logan Square, 130 N. 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JONATHAN WOY

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

One Logan Square

130 N. 18Th Street, SU 1210

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against LUCILLE TRELLA by JH FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY.(JACKSON, DAMIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#51

(#51) NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN JACKSON on behalf of JH FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY (JACKSON, DAMIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#50

(#50) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including John Wood Group plc with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#49

(#49) ANSWER to Complaint by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#48

(#48) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with 12/21/2021 by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#47

(#47) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#45

(#45) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Bayer AG with Certificate of Service by BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC..(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION.(DESIPIO, ADAM) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM A. DESIPIO on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DESIPIO, ADAM) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/22/2021) (mbh, ). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.(REBER, W.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group PLC by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15549164), filed by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/16/2021) (sbt, ). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against LUCILLE TRELLA by JH FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY.(JACKSON, DAMIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN JACKSON on behalf of JH FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY (JACKSON, DAMIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including John Wood Group plc with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ANSWER to Complaint by FOSTER WHEELER LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with 12/21/2021 by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Bayer AG with Certificate of Service by BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC..(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PNEUMO- ABEX LLC Successor in interest to Abex Corporaton.(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by CORY C. SIDELSKY on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(SIDELSKY, CORY) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT .PDF*Modified on 11/22/2021 (lisad, ). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION.(DESIPIO, ADAM) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM A. DESIPIO on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DESIPIO, ADAM) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/22/2021) (mbh, ). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.(REBER, W.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group PLC by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15549164), filed by JOHN CRANE INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/16/2021) (sbt, ). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE AJAX MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where REUNION INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Engineering Incorporated is a litigant