This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:58:57 (UTC).

Trehel Corporation v. National Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Trehel Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Fire and Marine Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01962

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trehel Corporation

Defendants

Atain Specialty Insurance Company

Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company

National Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company

Peleus Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

First Specialty Insurance Corp

American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company

Environmental Materials LLC doing business as Environmental Stoneworks

USF Insurance

Carl Catoe Construction Inc

Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina

P&L Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Grant Jones

Attorney at Elmore Goldsmith Kelley and deHoll PA

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1050

Greenville, SC 29601

Louie Franklin Elmore

Attorney at Elmore Goldsmith Kelley and deHoll PA

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1050

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsey W Cooper, Jr

Attorney at LW Cooper Jr Law Offices

36 Broad Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Dustin J Pitts

Attorney at LW Cooper Jr Law Offices

36 Broad Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Brian P Crotty

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Harriet Condon Ward

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

5 Exchange Street, Po Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402

John Lucius McCants

Attorney at Rogers Lewis Jackson Mann and Quinn LLC

1901 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29201

R Bruce Wallace

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Chas)

Po Box 486

Charleston, SC 29401

Cheryl D Shoun

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Chas)

Po Box 486

Charleston, SC 29401

William James Flynn

Attorney at Goodman McGuffey LLP

7 Technology Circle, Suite 460

Columbia, SC 29203

Brandon Gottschall

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Greg Horton

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

5 Exchange Street, Po Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402

Phillip Earl Reeves

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 10589

Greenville, SC 29603

William Duffie Powers

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd PA

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

Carter R Massingill

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 10589

Greenville, SC 29604

John Elliott Rogers, II

Attorney at Ward Law Firm

Po Box 5663

Spartanburg, SC 29304

Joel Anderson Berly, IV

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (CHS)

25 Calhoun Street, Suite 250

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert E Sumner, IV

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (CHS)

25 Calhoun Street, Suite 250

Columbia, SC 29201

Norman Ward Lambert

Attorney at Hudson Lambert Parrott Walker LLC

201 W Mcbee Avenue, Suite 450

Greenville, SC 29601

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#58

#56

#55

#54

#53

52 #3

Exhibit C - Transmittal Package/Letter with Subcontract and related materials

#52

27 #1

Exhibit A-Policy No. LGBGL64551

#27

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#4

#3

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (alew, ) Refiled by clerk to correct event type. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by P&L Enterprises LLC.(Lambert, Wesley) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ANSWER to Complaint by P&L Enterprises LLC.(Lambert, Wesley) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by Norman Ward Lambert on behalf of P&L Enterprises LLC (Lambert, Norman) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Benjamin Lambert on behalf of P&L Enterprises LLC (Lambert, Wesley) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Trehel Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/20/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit B - Dan Ryan Builders W. Virginia v. Main Street America Assurance Co.; 452 F.Supp.3d 338, #3 Exhibit C - Transmittal Package/Letter with Subcontract and related materials)(Jones, Alan) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Trehel Corporation. (Jones, Alan) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TEXT ORDER granting #45 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due by August 13, 2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/4/21.(alew, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION byTrehel Corporation re #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss . (Jones, Alan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss by Trehel Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Jones, Alan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Rule 7.1 Disclosure and Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Crotty, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Crotty, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ward, Harriet) Modified on 7/7/2021 to modify motion relief (alew, ). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Earl Reeves on behalf of American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Reeves, Phillip) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/6/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 7/6/2021 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by National Fire and Marine Insurance Company.(McCants, John) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by National Fire and Marine Insurance Company.(McCants, John) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (7/14/21). (alew, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Realign Subcontractor Defendants as Plaintiffs by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-4-00996. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9934611), filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL MATERIALS, LLC D/B/A ENVIRONMENTAL S is a litigant

Latest cases where USF INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Peleus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Employers Insurance Company of Wausau is a litigant