This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2020 at 10:16:28 (UTC).

Treakle et al v. Reinalt-Thomas Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Treakle filed an Other lawsuit against Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00587

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Randall Joe Thigpen

Thomas Treakle

Defendants

Reinalt-Thomas Corporation

Discount Tire Company Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hart Lawrence Robinovitch

Eric Neil Linsk

Robert K Shelquist

Brendan Stephen Thompson

J Olin McDougall, II

Christopher C Kessler

Defendant Attorneys

Michael T Williams

Mark Andrew Fuller

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Summons

#6

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended from May 4, 2020 to July 2, 2020. Defendants' opening memorandum may not exceed 22 pages. Plaintiffs shall file their responsive memorandum by August 3, 2020. Plaintiffs' responsive memorandum may not exceed 22 pages. Defendants shall file their reply memorandum by August 18, 2020. Defendants' reply memorandum may not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/4/20. (MAW) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Initial Response Deadline & Page Limits & to Set Briefing Schedule, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Discount Tire Company Incorporated, Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael T Williams on behalf of Defendants Discount Tire Company Incorporated and Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Charles LaDuca removed as counsel for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eric Neil Linsk on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for J Olin McDougall, II on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher C Kessler on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brendan Stephen Thompson on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert K Shelquist on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen, Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Reinalt-Thomas Corporation and Discount Tire Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18096813. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-587-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18096813 filed by Thomas Treakle, Randall Joe Thigpen. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less