This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2022 at 08:07:25 (UTC).

TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against T-Mobile USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00991

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

Defendants

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Sprint Communications Company, L.P.

Sprint Corporation

Sprint Spectrum, L.P.

Sprint Solutions, Inc.

Ericsson, Inc.

Nokia of America Corp.

Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler T. VanHoutan

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

845 Texas Ave., Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Patent Infringement by Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler T. VanHoutan on behalf of Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Communications Company, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Spectrum, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P. re #2 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Ericsson, Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Sprint Communications Company, L.P. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Ericsson, Inc., Nokia of America Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Sprint Communications Company, L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (sv) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

2 #7

Exhibit G

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #4

Exhibit D

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Sprint Communications Company, L.P. answer due 1/12/2023; Sprint Corporation answer due 1/12/2023; Sprint Solutions, Inc. answer due 1/12/2023; Sprint Spectrum, L.P. answer due 1/12/2023; T-Mobile USA, Inc. answer due 1/12/2023. (lad) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Patent Infringement by Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler T. VanHoutan on behalf of Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Communications Company, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party Sprint Spectrum, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., and Sprint Spectrum, L.P. answer due 11/28/2022. (zv) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy and Nokia of America Corp. answer due 1/12/2023. Per EKlc, 90 day extension is fine for this case. (zv) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P. re #2 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corp. re #2 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Ericsson, Inc. answer due 11/28/2022; Sprint Communications Company, L.P. answer due 11/28/2022; T-Mobile USA, Inc. answer due 11/28/2022. (bw) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Ericsson, Inc. re #2 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #2 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Ericsson, Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Sprint Communications Company, L.P. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Ericsson, Inc., Nokia of America Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Sprint Communications Company, L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (sv) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's standing orders at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/.The following orders were updated on 9/16/22:1. Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases.(lad) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16552463), filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Traxcell Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ERICSSON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant