This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 07:09:06 (UTC).

TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING USA , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01000

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

Defendant

SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A & B

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC. served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketReset Answer Deadlines: SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC. answer due 12/1/2022. (sv) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Regarding Agreed Extension by SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC. served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to SHOPIFY DATA PROCESSING (USA), INC.. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16557680), filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Traxcell Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III