This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 08:37:49 (UTC).

TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. MAPLEBEAR, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MAPLEBEAR, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alia Moses. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alia Moses

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

Defendant

MAPLEBEAR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Lance E. Wyatt, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Aaron P. Pirouznia

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 50000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A & B

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to MAPLEBEAR, INC.. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. MAPLEBEAR, INC. served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron P. Pirouznia on behalf of MAPLEBEAR, INC.. Attorney Aaron P. Pirouznia added to party MAPLEBEAR, INC.(pty:dft) (Pirouznia, Aaron) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr on behalf of MAPLEBEAR, INC.. Attorney Lance E. Wyatt, Jr added to party MAPLEBEAR, INC.(pty:dft) (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr on behalf of MAPLEBEAR, INC.. Attorney Lance E. Wyatt, Jr added to party MAPLEBEAR, INC.(pty:dft) (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: MAPLEBEAR, INC. answer due 12/1/2022 per TClc. (zv) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by MAPLEBEAR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #7 Notice (Other). Please be advise that the case number listed in the case style of the document is incorrect. Please refile with the correct case number of 6:22-cv-00999. Also, this Notice is being addressed with Chambers if it needs to be filed as a Motion. Further instruction is forthcoming. Thank you. (zv) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron P. Pirouznia on behalf of MAPLEBEAR, INC.. Attorney Aaron P. Pirouznia added to party MAPLEBEAR, INC.(pty:dft) (Pirouznia, Aaron) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer by MAPLEBEAR, INC. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. MAPLEBEAR, INC. served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to MAPLEBEAR, INC.. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16557547), filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Traxcell Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Potter Pirouznia