Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 09:11:23 (UTC).

TRAVIST V 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 TRAVIST filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01161

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAVIST PATRICK

Defendants

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey D Marshall

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

Aram V. Desteian

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th St., Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lewis A Remele, Jr

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Ste 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brittany B Skemp

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

ERIN J ROGIERS

Attorney at WATTS GUERRA LLP - SAN ANTONIO TX

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3 Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

MIKAL WATTS

Attorney at WATTS GUERRA LLP - SAN ANTONIO TX

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3 Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant Attorneys

Faris Rashid

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S. Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

BENJAMIN W HULSE

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

JERRY W BLACKWELL

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

MONICA L. DAVIES

Attorney at Monica Davies

431 South Seventh Street, Ste 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of TRAVIST PATRICK (ROGIERS, ERIN) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of TRAVIST PATRICK (WATTS, MIKAL) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00804. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00782-JRT-KMM et al.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Travist Patrick and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travist Patrick. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Remele, Lewis) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travist Patrick. 3M Company served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Remele, Lewis) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-804 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge David S. Dtoy, and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/22/19. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6752256) filed by Patrick Travist. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Remele, Lewis) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of TRAVIST PATRICK (ROGIERS, ERIN) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of TRAVIST PATRICK (WATTS, MIKAL) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00804. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00782-JRT-KMM et al.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • (#9) (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/12/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Travist Patrick and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travist Patrick. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Remele, Lewis) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travist Patrick. 3M Company served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Remele, Lewis) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-804 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge David S. Dtoy, and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/22/19. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, and Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-804 (PAM/ECW). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6752256) filed by Patrick Travist. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Remele, Lewis) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany B Skemp

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIN J ROGIERS