This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2021 at 08:49:17 (UTC).

Travieso v. ParkMobile, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Travieso filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ParkMobile, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02496

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heriberto Travieso

Defendant

ParkMobile, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen Hanson Riebel

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen

100 Washington Avenue South, 2200 Washington Square

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2179

James J. Pizzirusso

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

888 16Th Street, Ste 300

Washington, DC 20006

Kate M. Baxter-Kauf

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen

100 Washington Avenue South, 2200 Washington Square

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2179

MaryBeth Vassil Gibson

Attorney at The Finley Firm, P.C.

Building 14, Suite 230, 3535 Piedmont Road

Atlanta, GA 30305

Steven Nathan

Attorney at Hausfeld, LLP

33 Whitehall Street

New York, NY 10004

Terence R. Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road

Cincinnati, OH 45209

N. Nickolas Jackson

Attorney at The Finley Firm, P.C.

Building 14, Suite 230, 3535 Piedmont Road

Atlanta, GA 30305

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Gieser

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon

1230 Peachtree Street, Suite 1200

Atlanta, GA 30309

Joshua Luke Becker

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

1230 Peachtree Street, Suite 1200

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (ddm) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting the parties' #7 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 1-21-CV-02252, George v. ParkMobile, LLC, and Case No. 1:21-CV-02496-SCJ, Travieso v. ParkMobile, LLC, are hereby consolidated with Case No. 1:21-CV-02182-SCJ, Baker v. ParkMobile, LLC, and shall proceed under Case No. 1 :21-CV-02182-SCJ. The Clerk is to designate Case Nos. 1-21-CV-02252 and 1:21-CV-02496-SCJ as related/member cases on CM/ECF and thereafter administratively terminate said cases. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/7/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Heriberto Travieso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by N. Nickolas Jackson on behalf of Heriberto Travieso (Jackson, N.) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Gieser on behalf of ParkMobile, LLC (Gieser, Caroline) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by ParkMobile, LLC. ParkMobile, LLC served on 6/22/2021. (Becker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Luke Becker on behalf of ParkMobile, LLC (Becker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to ParkMobile, LLC. (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Heriberto Travieso with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11052227) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ParkMobile, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Luke Becker