This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2021 at 07:13:56 (UTC).

Travelscape LLC v. Crossmedia, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2021 Travelscape LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Crossmedia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelscape LLC doing business as Expedia Group Media Solutions

Defendant

Crossmedia, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christos Papapetrou

Attorney at Levine Lee LLP

5 Columbus Circle, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Kenneth E. Lee

Attorney at Levine Lee LLP

5 Columbus Circle, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Rahul Wanchoo

Attorney at Law Offices of Rahul Wanchoo

Empire State Building, 350 Fifth Avenue, 59Th Floor

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

6 #5

Exhibit Standard Terms

6 #4

Exhibit Invoices

6 #3

Exhibit Dollar Contract

6 #2

Exhibit Thrifty Contract

6 #1

Exhibit Hertz Contract

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit Standard Terms

1 #4

Exhibit Invoices

1 #3

Exhibit Dollar Contract

1 #2

Exhibit Thrifty Contract

1 #1

Exhibit Hertz Contract

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (kv) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for March 3, 2021 is ADJOURNED until April 13, 2021 at 10:00a.m. The parties shall jointly submitted a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order one week prior to the conference. The case is STAYED in the meantime. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/23/2021) (kv) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Christos G. Papapetrou dated 2/22/2021. Document filed by Travelscape LLC..(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Complaint,., ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Crossmedia, Inc...(Wanchoo, Rahul) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crossmedia, Inc...(Wanchoo, Rahul) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rahul Wanchoo on behalf of Crossmedia, Inc...(Wanchoo, Rahul) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth E. Lee on behalf of Travelscape LLC..(Lee, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 3, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. The time period for any Defendant intending to move to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 12 will be extended until further order of the Court upon the filing of a simple letter with the Court within the time permitted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) and prior to the time the above-mentioned submission is made. Such letter should simply indicate in one sentence the Defendant's intent to make a motion to dismiss. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/25/21) (yv) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Crossmedia, Inc. served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Travelscape LLC..(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against Crossmedia, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23329211)Document filed by Travelscape LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hertz Contract, #2 Exhibit Thrifty Contract, #3 Exhibit Dollar Contract, #4 Exhibit Invoices, #5 Exhibit Standard Terms).(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crossmedia, Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christos Papapetrou. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Travelscape LLC d/b/a Expedia Group Media Solutions. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christos Papapetrou to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Crossmedia, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Travelscape LLC d/b/a Expedia Group Media Solutions..(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 01/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Expedia, Inc., Other Affiliate Expedia Group, Inc. for Travelscape LLC d/b/a Expedia Group Media Solutions. Document filed by Travelscape LLC d/b/a Expedia Group Media Solutions..(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 01/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 01/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Crossmedia, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23320955)Document filed by Travelscape LLC d/b/a Expedia Group Media Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hertz Contract, #2 Exhibit Thrifty Contract, #3 Exhibit Dollar Contract, #4 Exhibit Invoices, #5 Exhibit Standard Terms).(Papapetrou, Christos) (Entered: 01/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelscape, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christos Papapetrou