This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:15:28 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. United States Liability Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Liability Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09198

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendant

United States Liability Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cynthia Coulter Mulvihill

Attorney at Diederich and Associates

Po Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

Rachel J. Fain

Attorney at Reid and Associates

Po Box 2996

Hartford, CT 06104-2996

Defendant Attorneys

Richard David Bremer

Attorney at Sacro Walker LLP

700 North Brand Boulevard Suite 610

Glendale, CA 91203

William K Enger

Attorney at Sacro and Walker LLP

700 North Brand Boulevard Suite 610

Glendale, CA 91203

Jennifer Yu Sacro

Attorney at Sacro and Walker LLP

700 North Brand Boulevard Suite 610

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel J Fain APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, designating Cynthia C Mulvihill as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel J. Fain to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32604595) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Document is an APPLICATION not a REQUEST. (lt) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Liability Insurance Company answer now due 2/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company.(Attorney Jennifer Yu Sacro added to party United States Liability Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anjelica Lloyd, Legal Secretary - Authorized to Accept Service of behalf of Sacro and Walker - Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09198 JAK(KSx). (rn) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2-3

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2-2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2-1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel J Fain APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, designating Cynthia C Mulvihill as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel J. Fain to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32604595) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Document is an APPLICATION not a REQUEST. (lt) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel J. Fain to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32604595) filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Liability Insurance Company answer now due 2/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company.(Attorney Jennifer Yu Sacro added to party United States Liability Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anjelica Lloyd, Legal Secretary - Authorized to Accept Service of behalf of Sacro and Walker - Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09198 JAK(KSx). (rn) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Exhibit 3 as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32380232 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Attorney Cynthia Coulter Mulvihill added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Mulvihill, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant