This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 05:56:49 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Mercury Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01106

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendants

First Mercury Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation

National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, an Illinois corporation

1-10 DOES

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

First Mercury Insurance Company

National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford

Does 1 through 100 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abel Eric Aguilera

Attorney at The Aguilera Law Group APLC

650 Town Center Drive Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Kimberly R Arnal

Attorney at Aguilera Law Group APLC

650 Town Center Drive Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Raymond E Brown

Attorney at The Aguilera Law Group APLC

23046 Avenida De La Carlota Suite 300

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Ryan C Kossler

Attorney at The Aguilera Law Group APLc

650 Town Center Drive Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Lamar Cope

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett

624 South Grand Avenue Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Susan J Field

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett LLP

One Wilshire Building, 624 South Grand Avenue Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

Stephen L Cope

Attorney at Musick Peeler & Garrett, LLP

One Wilshire Building, 624 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Robert C Christensen

Attorney at CNA Coverage Litigation Group

555 12Th Street Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Change of address by Abel Eric Aguilera attorney for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Changing attorneys address to 23046 Avenida De La Carlota, Suite 300, Laguna Hills, CA 92653. Filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Aguilera, Abel) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Christensen, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford.(Attorney Robert C Christensen added to party National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford(pty:dft))(Christensen, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re: Notice (Other), #8 (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit to Notice of Errata (Ex C to Removal)

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 6/24/21. (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of address by Abel Eric Aguilera attorney for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Changing attorneys address to 23046 Avenida De La Carlota, Suite 300, Laguna Hills, CA 92653. Filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Aguilera, Abel) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Christensen, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford.(Attorney Robert C Christensen added to party National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford(pty:dft))(Christensen, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re: Notice (Other), #8 (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA RE EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) [DIVERSITY JURISDICTION] filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Errata (Ex C to Removal))(Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, Inc., Agent for Service - By serving Kaitlyn Mannix, Workflow Coordinator in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/1/2021 Submitted with Exhibit B Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service - By serving Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Ci vil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/1/2021 Submitted with Exhibit B Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, Inc., Agent for Service - By serving Kaitlyn Mannix, Workflow Coordinator in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/1/2021 Submitted with Exhibit B Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Filed in State Court on 4/27/202 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 6/24/21. (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01198399-CU-IC-CXC Receipt No: BCACDC-31525946 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Stephen Cope, #4 Exhibit 1 to Cope Decl, #5 Exhibit 2 to Cope Decl, #6 Exhibit 3 to Cope Decl, #7 Exhibit 4 to Cope Decl, #8 Exhibit 5 to Cope Decl) (Attorney Stephen L Cope added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Cope, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Mercury Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant