This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2021 at 09:46:20 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. C.H. Robinson International Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against C H Robinson International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Michael J. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01891

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendant

C.H. Robinson International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea C. Mejia

Attorney at Pfefferle Kane LLP

100 North Sixth St. Suite 600A

Minneapolis, MN 55403

David Gordon Watson

Attorney at Pfefferle Kane LLP

600A Butler Square Building, 100 North Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55403

Jessica K. Allen

Attorney at Pfefferle Kane LLP

100 North Sixth Street, Ste 600A

Minneapolis, MN 55403

Defendant Attorney

Mark G Pryor

Attorney at Brown & Carlson, PA

300 Highway 169 South, Suite 500

Minneapolis, MN 55426

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

8 #1

Consent Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 11/23/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/23/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pryor, Mark) Modified text on 10/7/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Pryor on behalf of C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Pryor, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Mejia, Andrea) Modified text on 8/27/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc. (MTP) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-01891 MJD/DTS. (MTP) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Mejia, Andrea) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CH Robinson International Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8966825) filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mejia, Andrea) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CH Robinson Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant