This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:22:16 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09388

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendants

All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc.

APL Logistics Ltd.

Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line

China Int'l Freight Co., Ltd.

Danmar Lines Ltd. a/k/a Danmar Lines AG

FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency (Shanghai) Company Limited

Laufer Group International Ltd.

Master International Logistics (China) Co., Ltd.

Orient Express Container Co., Ltd.

Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.

Shenzhen Yukon Logistics Co., Ltd.

Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc.

Danmar Lines Ltd.

Kuehne + Nagel Inc. doing business as Blue Anchor America Line

Danmar Lines AG

FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin John Byron O'Malley

Attorney at Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney

88 Pine Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Patrick Colm Nolan

Attorney at Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney

88 Pine Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#36

(#36) STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties herein that the time for Defendant, FEDEX INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT FORWARDING AGENCY SERVICES (SHANGHAI) COMPANY LIMITED to serve and file an Answer, shall be and is hereby extended to January 4, 2022. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited answer due 1/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#35

(#35) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited..(Cottrell, Floyd) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#34

(#34) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Master International Logistics (China) Co., Ltd...(gp) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

33 #1

Exhibit Full Caption

33 #33

Main Document

#32

(#32) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#31

(#31) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#30

(#30) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laufer Group International Ltd.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#29

(#29) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danmar Lines Ltd.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#28

(#28) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

27 #1

Exhibit Full Caption

27 #27

Main Document

26 #1

Exhibit Full Caption

26 #26

Main Document

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties herein that the time for Defendant, FEDEX INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT FORWARDING AGENCY SERVICES (SHANGHAI) COMPANY LIMITED to serve and file an Answer, shall be and is hereby extended to January 4, 2022. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited answer due 1/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited..(Cottrell, Floyd) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Master International Logistics (China) Co., Ltd...(gp) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MASTER INTERNATIONAL LOGISTICS (CHINA) CO., LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Full Caption).(Nolan, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Patrick Colm Nolan to RE-FILE Document No. #25 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error. Defendant party name listed on Summons does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laufer Group International Ltd.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danmar Lines Ltd.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin John Byron O'Malley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 1,716,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,717,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin John Byron O'Malley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Danmar Lines Ltd. a/k/a Danmar Lines AG, Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency (Shanghai) Company Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was entered incorrectly; party name was entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orient Express Container Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin) Modified on 11/15/2021 (vf). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin) Modified on 11/15/2021 (vf). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21cv07994. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against APL Logistics Ltd., Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc., All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc., China Int'l Freight Co., Ltd., Danmar Lines Ltd. a/k/a Danmar Lines AG, FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited, Kuehne + Nagel Inc. d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, Laufer Group International Ltd., Master International Logistics (China) Co., Ltd., Orient Express Container Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yukon Logistics Co., Ltd., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25329451)Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Danmar Lines Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Orient Express Container Co., Ltd. is a litigant