This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 07:34:56 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Ace American Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07135

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendants

Ace America Insurance Company, Inc.

Ace American Insurance Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey V. Commisso

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin et al.

501 W Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

John T. Brooks

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Katherine Anne Sharpless

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Ace American Insurance Company, Inc.. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America on Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint byAce American Insurance Company, Inc.. (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#11

(#11) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Ace American Insurance Company, Inc.. Defendant's F.R.C.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. Defendant's L.R. 3-15 Notice of Interested Parties (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#13

(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by November 12, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#14

(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ace American Insurance Company, Inc... (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ace American Insurance Company, Inc... (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by November 12, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. Defendant's L.R. 3-15 Notice of Interested Parties (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Ace American Insurance Company, Inc.. Defendant's F.R.C.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint byAce American Insurance Company, Inc.. (Sharpless, Katherine) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America on Ace American Insurance Company, Inc. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Ace American Insurance Company, Inc.. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America . (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version from website https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the docume nt is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc., a publicly-traded company, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ace America Insurance Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16392125.). Filed byTravelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant