Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2021 at 08:43:17 (UTC).

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA et al v. THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION EUROPE LIMITED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward S. Kiel and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2003 FOR THE 2017 YOA

THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY

AMTRUST LLOYDS SYNDICATE 9577

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.

RIVERSTONE SYNDICATE 1897

CATLIN SYNDICATE LIMITED

SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE UK BRANCH

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

XL SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, INC.

Defendant

THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN T. LILLIS, JR.

Attorney at KENNEDY LILLIS SCHMIDT & ENGLISH

75 Maiden Lane, Suite 402

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN B WILGUS

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

301 Carnegie Center, 3Rd Floor

Princeton, NY 08540

 

Court Documents

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John D. Kimball

8 #2

Declaration of John D. Kimball in Support

8 #1

Declaration of Lauren Wilgus in Support

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Wilgus in Support, #2 Declaration of John D. Kimball in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John D. Kimball)(WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply)(WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AMTRUST LLOYDS SYNDICATE 9577, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., CATLIN SYNDICATE LIMITED, LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2003 FOR THE 2017 YOA, NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RIVERSTONE SYNDICATE 1897, STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, INC., SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE UK BRANCH, THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, XL SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY re #4 MOTION to Remand (LILLIS, JOHN) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

4 #3

Exhibit 1

4 #2

Declaration

4 #1

Brief

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by AMTRUST LLOYDS SYNDICATE 9577, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., CATLIN SYNDICATE LIMITED, LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2003 FOR THE 2017 YOA, NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RIVERSTONE SYNDICATE 1897, STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, INC., SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE UK BRANCH, THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, XL SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1)(LILLIS, JOHN) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED from Superior Court, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-004552-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11930652), filed by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint - State Court)(WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Wilgus in Support, #2 Declaration of John D. Kimball in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John D. Kimball)(WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply)(WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AMTRUST LLOYDS SYNDICATE 9577, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., CATLIN SYNDICATE LIMITED, LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2003 FOR THE 2017 YOA, NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RIVERSTONE SYNDICATE 1897, STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, INC., SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE UK BRANCH, THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, XL SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY re #4 MOTION to Remand (LILLIS, JOHN) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED re #4 MOTION to Remand (WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand by AMTRUST LLOYDS SYNDICATE 9577, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., CATLIN SYNDICATE LIMITED, LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2003 FOR THE 2017 YOA, NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RIVERSTONE SYNDICATE 1897, STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, INC., SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE UK BRANCH, THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, XL SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1)(LILLIS, JOHN) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER: Despite the contrary assertions by defendant, the removal of this case from state court on January 6, 2021 based on admiralty jurisdiction may have been in violation of the saving-to-suitors clause of 28 U.S.C. 1333(1), which provides that "[t]he district courts shall have original jurisdiction, exclusive of the courts of the States, of... [a]ny civil case of admiralty or maritime jurisdiction, saving to suitors in all cases all other remedies to which they are otherwise entitled," and thus preserves the right of a plaintiff, i.e., the "suitor," to be "saved" from removal and to remain in state court. See Romero v. Int'l Terminal Operating Co., 358 U.S. 354, 371 (1959); Madruga v. Superior Ct., 346 U.S. 556, 560 (1954). If removal of this case was contrary to the saving-to-suitors clause, and plaintiffs intend to object based on those grounds, then plaintiffs must file a formal motion to remand to state court by February 5, 2021 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). If plaintiffs do not file such motion, then this litigation will proceed in federal court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/19/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED from Superior Court, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-004552-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11930652), filed by THE UNITED KINGDOM MUTUAL STEAM SHIP ASSURANCE ASSOCIATION (EUROPE) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint - State Court)(WILGUS, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant