This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 10:08:27 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Columbia Asphalt Gravel Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas O. Rice. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03094

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas O. Rice

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

The Travelers Indemnity Company

The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

St Paul Guardian Insurance Company

Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company

Defendants

Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc

Columbia Ready-Mix Inc

LSL Properties LLC

Lawrence Sali

Steven Sali

Deleta Sali

Gayle Sali

Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric J Neal

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 West Lake Avenue North, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Kasie Kashimoto

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 West Lake Avenue North, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Thomas Lether

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 West Lake Avenue North, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Defendant Attorneys

Peter M Ritchie

Attorney at Meyer Fluegge & Tenney PS

230 S 2Nd Street, Po Box 22680

Yakima, WA 98907

Francis S Floyd

Attorney at Floyd Pflueger & Ringer PS

200 West Thomas Street, Suite 500

Seattle, WA 98119

William J Dow

Attorney at Floyd Pflueger & Ringer PS

200 West Thomas Street, Suite 500

Seattle, WA 98119

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by William J Dow on behalf of Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company (Attorney William J Dow added to party Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company(pty:dft))(Dow, William) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis S Floyd on behalf of Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company (Attorney Francis S Floyd added to party Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company(pty:dft))(Floyd, Francis) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#16

(#16) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#15

(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St Paul Guardian Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#14

(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#13

(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#12

(#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Deleta Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Gayle Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Lawrence Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Steven Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Columbia Ready-Mix Inc. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M Ritchie on behalf of Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc, Columbia Ready-Mix Inc, Deleta Sali, Gayle Sali, Lawrence Sali, Steven Sali (Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Columbia Ready-Mix Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Deleta Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Gayle Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Lawrence Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Steven Sali(pty:dft))(Ritchie, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re LSL Properties LLC. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by William J Dow on behalf of Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company (Attorney William J Dow added to party Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company(pty:dft))(Dow, William) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis S Floyd on behalf of Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company (Attorney Francis S Floyd added to party Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company(pty:dft))(Floyd, Francis) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St Paul Guardian Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Deleta Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Gayle Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Lawrence Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Steven Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Columbia Ready-Mix Inc. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M Ritchie on behalf of Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc, Columbia Ready-Mix Inc, Deleta Sali, Gayle Sali, Lawrence Sali, Steven Sali (Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Columbia Ready-Mix Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Deleta Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Gayle Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Lawrence Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Steven Sali(pty:dft))(Ritchie, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re LSL Properties LLC. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Columbia Ready-Mix Inc, #2 LSL Properties LLC, #3 Lawrence Sali, #4 Steven Sali, #5 Deleta Sali, #6 Gayle Sali, #7 Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company)(TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3829013) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Columbia Asphalt & Gravel, Inc., #3 Summons Columbia Ready-Mix, Inc., #4 Summons LSL Properties, LLC, #5 Summons Lawrence Sali, #6 Summons Steven Sali, #7 Summons Deleta Sali, #8 Summons Gayle Sali, #9 Summons Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company)(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity and Guaranty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Oak Fire Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant