This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2021 at 08:56:02 (UTC).

TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA v. K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00854

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendants

K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES

LINDA JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradford Schane Moyer

Attorney at PLUNKETT COONEY (Indianapolis)

950 Trade Centre Way, Suite 310

Kalamazoo, MI 49002

John F. Sullivan

Attorney at PLUNKETT COONEY, P.C.

221 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorney

Ty Michael Craver

Attorney at VAN VALER LAW FIRM, LLP

225 S. Emerson Ave., Suite 181

Greenwood, IN 46143

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA . (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER - in order for the Court to determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this matter, the parties are ORDERED to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement by June 15, 2021, properly setting forth each party's citizenship. If agreement cannot be reached on the contents of a joint jurisdictional statement, competing statements must be filed by that date. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/25/2021. (MAC) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

24 #2

Exhibit 2 - ADP Payroll Documents for Claimant

24 #1

Exhibit 1 - Application for Benefits

#24

(#24) Statement (Supplemental) Statement on Diversity Jurisdiction by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Benefits, #2 Exhibit 2 - ADP Payroll Documents for Claimant)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION REGARDING AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY, filed by Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/5/2021.(CBU) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. for TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#20

(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES. (Craver, Ty) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to LINDA JAMES, K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Schane Moyer on behalf of Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

1 #5

Proposed Summons to K Camp Realty LLC and Linda James

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Rescission

1 #2

Exhibit B - Cancellation Notice to Insured

1 #1

Exhibit A - Travelers Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against LINDA JAMES, K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES, filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6500398) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Travelers Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Cancellation Notice to Insured, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Rescission, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons to K Camp Realty LLC and Linda James)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA . (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER - in order for the Court to determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this matter, the parties are ORDERED to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement by June 15, 2021, properly setting forth each party's citizenship. If agreement cannot be reached on the contents of a joint jurisdictional statement, competing statements must be filed by that date. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/25/2021. (MAC) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Statement (Supplemental) Statement on Diversity Jurisdiction by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Benefits, #2 Exhibit 2 - ADP Payroll Documents for Claimant)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION REGARDING AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY, filed by Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/5/2021.(CBU) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. for TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES. (Craver, Ty) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER - in order for the Court to determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this matter, the parties are ORDERED to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement by May 24, 2021, properly setting forth each party's citizenship and whether the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs. If agreement cannot be reached on the contents of a joint jurisdictional statement, competing statements must be filed by that date. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/3/2021. (MAC) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (RAGS). (MAC) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint , filed by K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES.(Craver, Ty) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LINDA JAMES, K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES, filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Traveler's Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Cancellation Notice to Insured, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Rescission)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Attorney(s) John F. Sullivan to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice - John Sullivan)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - For these reasons, the Court ORDERS Travelers to file an Amended Complaint by April 27, 2021 which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Defendants need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendants are cautioned, however, that when they do respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that they deny any of Travelers' jurisdictional allegations or state that they do not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/13/2021.(JDC) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to LINDA JAMES, K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES. (MAC) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Bradford Schane Moyer hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to LINDA JAMES, K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Schane Moyer on behalf of Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against LINDA JAMES, K CAMP REALTY, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company, individually and doing business as COLUMBUS VILLAGE TOWNHOMES, filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6500398) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Travelers Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Cancellation Notice to Insured, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Rescission, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons to K Camp Realty LLC and Linda James)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Francis Sullivan, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford S. Moyer