This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2019 at 07:18:30 (UTC).

Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al v. Omni Contracting Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Travelers Casualty Surety Company of America filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Omni Contracting Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-01253

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America

United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company

St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Defendants

Omni Contracting Company, Inc.

Haleem Zihenni

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanne M. Bonacci

Paul Michael McCormick

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Michael McCormick on behalf of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (McCormick, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty And Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. Document filed by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company.(McCormick, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Joanne M. Bonacci to RE-FILE Document #8 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Bonacci, Joanne) Modified on 2/12/2019 (lb). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bonacci, Joanne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Omni Contracting Company, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Haleem Zihenni. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joanne M. Bonacci. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joanne M. Bonacci to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no courthouse selection was made on the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bonacci, Joanne) Modified on 2/11/2019 (pne). (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Omni Contracting Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Bonacci, Joanne) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Haleem Zihenni, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Bonacci, Joanne) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Omni Contracting Company, Inc., Haleem Zihenni. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16321932)Document filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bonacci, Joanne) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less