Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 09:03:34 (UTC).

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America v. 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane J. Boyle and David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jane J. Boyle

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Defendant and Counter Claimant

2000 West Northwest Highway Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Alissa Puckett

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Wm Lance Lewis

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jonathan Parkey Ayers

Attorney at Ayers & Ayers

4205 Gateway Dr, Suite 100

Colleyville, TX 76034

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/14/2021) (oyh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. (Ayers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America filed by 2000 West Northwest Highway IncAttorney Jonathan Parkey Ayers added to party 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc(pty:dft) (Ayers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. (oyh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:21-cv-453-N. (axm) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 2000 West Northwest Highway, Inc. filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11661637) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/14/2021) (oyh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. (Ayers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America filed by 2000 West Northwest Highway IncAttorney Jonathan Parkey Ayers added to party 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc(pty:dft) (Ayers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to 2000 West Northwest Highway Inc. (oyh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:21-cv-453-N. (axm) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 2000 West Northwest Highway, Inc. filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11661637) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alissa Puckett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wm Lance Lewis