This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2022 at 19:51:38 (UTC).

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company v. Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Travelers Casualty and Surety Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn, Jr and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

Referral Judge

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

William Banholzer

Suzanne Stefany

Bruce Taten

Matthew Ross

Anthony Munk

Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.

Patrick Tolbert

Steven Wynne

Roderick Wendt

Gregory Maxwell

Martha Byorum

Gary S. Michel

Mark A. Beck

Kirk S. Hachigian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jang H. Jo

Attorney at Smith Anderson Blount Dorsett Mitchell & Jernigan

P. O. Box 6011

Raleigh, NC 27602-6011

Jason Chirstopher Reichlyn

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

1301 K St. N.W., Ste. 1100 W

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas James Judge, Jr.

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

1301 K St. N.W., Ste 1100 W

Washington, DC 20005

Michael William Mitchell

Attorney at Smith Anderson

P.O. Box2611

Raleigh, NC 27602

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Charles DeCelle

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.

101 N. Tryon St., Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Gabriel J. LeChevallier

Attorney at Parsons Farnell & Grein LLP

1030 Sw Morrison Street

Portland, OR 97205

Michael E. Farnell

Attorney at Parsons Farnell & Grein LLP

1030 Sw Morrison Street

Portland, OR 97205

R. Steven DeGeorge

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, PA

101 North Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Other Attorneys

Courtney Ashe Palko

Attorney at Baute Crochetiere & Hartley LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael J. Hartley

Attorney at Baute Crochetiere & Hartley LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Walter E. Brock, Jr.

Attorney at Young, Moore & Henderson, P.A.

3101 Glenwood Avenue, Post Office Box 31627

Raleigh, NC 27622

 

Court Documents

91 #1

Supplemental Declaration of Kelly Beegle

91 #91

Main Document

#90

(#90) ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Reply due by 5/27/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/10/2022. (ams) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#89

(#89) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (DeGeorge, R.) Modified to remove referral on 5/10/2022 (mga). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

88 #6

Exhibit Ex. 41 - Notice of Derivative Action

88 #5

Exhibit Ex. 40 - Notice of 03-03-2021 letter from John Ward

88 #3

Exhibit Ex. 38 - Notice of 11-03-2020 letter from Shieta Black

#86

(#86) RESPONSE in Support re #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#65

(#82) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands, #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 4/25/2022 (Jo, Jang). Modified to remove referral on 4/11/2022 (mga). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Kelly Beegle)(DeGeorge, R.) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Reply due by 5/27/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/10/2022. (ams) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (DeGeorge, R.) Modified to remove referral on 5/10/2022 (mga). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) DECLARATION re #86 Response in Support of Motion, #87 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 36 - Docket as of 05/05/2022, #2 Exhibit Ex. 37 - Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 38 - Notice of 11-03-2020 letter from Shieta Black, #4 Exhibit Ex. 39 - Notice of 12-18-2020 Letter from City of Miami, #5 Exhibit Ex. 40 - Notice of 03-03-2021 letter from John Ward, #6 Exhibit Ex. 41 - Notice of Derivative Action)(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Replies due by 5/13/2022 (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) RESPONSE in Support re #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ORDER granting #83 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Sean W. Carney as Counsel of Record for Defendants/Third Party Plainitiff. Attorney Sean W Carney's representation of Defendants/Third Party Plaintiff in this matter is hereby terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/12/22. (mga) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay, #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment-Cross-Motion. Responses due by 5/6/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/11/2022. (ams) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Sean W. Carney as Counsel of Record for Defendants/Third Party Plainitiff, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 4/25/2022 ) by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands, #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 4/25/2022 (Jo, Jang). Modified to remove referral on 4/11/2022 (mga). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. (DeGeorge, R.) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Charles DeCelle on behalf of All Defendants (DeCelle, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of All Defendants (DeGeorge, R.) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. All Defendants. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(tlj) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jang H. Jo on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Jo, Jang) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William Mitchell on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4990989), filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga). Modified text on 4/20/2021 (tlj). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walter E. Brock, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Hartley