This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:28:53 (UTC).

TravelCenters of America Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 TravelCenters of America Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lexington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-12135

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TravelCenters of America Inc.

Defendants

Lexington Insurance Company

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harry L. Manion, III

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

60 State Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02109

Christopher J. Cunio

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

60 State Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth N. Thayer

Attorney at Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, P.C.

101 Merrimac Street, 9Th Floor

Boston, MA 02114

Julia M. Beckley

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Ste 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M. Beckley on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Beckley, Julia) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#12

(#12) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court- Suffolk Superior Court. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) ). (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#11

(#11) Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re #10 Motion to Remand (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Remand by TravelCenters of America Inc..(Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TravelCenters of America Inc.. (Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

8 #1

16.b notice

8 #8

16.b notice

6 #7

Exhibit G

6 #6

Exhibit F

6 #5

Exhibit E

6 #4

Exhibit D

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff TravelCenters of America Inc.'s Motion to Remand and Motion for Costs and Attorneys Fees by TravelCenters of America Inc..(Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexington Insurance Company. (Thayer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M. Beckley on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Beckley, Julia) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court- Suffolk Superior Court. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) ). (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re #10 Motion to Remand (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Remand by TravelCenters of America Inc..(Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TravelCenters of America Inc.. (Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference/Motion hearing by VIDEO on 2/15/2022 at 9:30 AM. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference/Motion hearing set for 2/15/2022 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Molloy, Maryellen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #1 16.b notice) (Molloy, Maryellen). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and 16.b Scheduling Conference by VIDEO on 2/15/2022 at 9:30 AM Plaintiff TravelCenters of America Inc.'s Motion to Remand and Motion for Costs and Attorneys Fees : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing/16.b Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff TravelCenters of America Inc.'s Motion to Remand and Motion for Costs and Attorneys Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff TravelCenters of America Inc.'s Motion to Remand and for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by TravelCenters of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff TravelCenters of America Inc.'s Motion to Remand and Motion for Costs and Attorneys Fees by TravelCenters of America Inc..(Cunio, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexington Insurance Company. (Thayer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexington Insurance Co. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9115201 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Lexington Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet )(Thayer, Kenneth) Modified on 12/28/2021 to correct the text to reflect the document that is being filed a Notice of Removal. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELCENTERS OF AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth N. Thayer