This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:14:09 (UTC).

Tranter v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Tranter filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Max O. Cogburn, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deidre L. Tranter

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell R. Bowling

Attorney at Law Office of Russell R. Bowling

77 West Main St.

Franklin, NC 28734

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidre L. Tranter. Andrew M. Saul served on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Bowling, Russell) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew M. Saul. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (hms) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing Fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4697273), filed by Deidre L. Tranter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowling, Russell) Modified text on 10/2/2020, NEF Regenerated. (ejb) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less