This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 08:59:06 (UTC).

Transou v. Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Transou filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and S. Thomas Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01062

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie D. Transou

Defendant

Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Leyes

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP - Memphis

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 312

Memphis, TN 38120

George D Adams

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP - Louisville

220 W. Main Street, Ste 1700

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons to be Issued

1 #3

Exhibit A- Valerie Transou Consent to Join

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valerie D. Transou. Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Leyes on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Boshoku America, Inc. for Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC.. (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by George D Adams on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Adams, George) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Valerie D. Transou of Consent to Join of Garrick Reed (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Valerie D. Transou of Consent to Join of Edith Thomas (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT' UNOPPOSED #16 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/8/22. (mbm) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT' UNOPPOSED #16 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/8/22. (mbm) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Valerie D. Transou of Consent to Join of Edith Thomas (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Valerie D. Transou of Consent to Join of Garrick Reed (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by George D Adams on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Adams, George) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Boshoku America, Inc. for Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC.. (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Leyes on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valerie D. Transou. Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3851155), filed by Valerie D. Transou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Exhibit A- Valerie Transou Consent to Join)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney L. Leyes