This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2021 at 12:02:09 (UTC).

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC v. ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC

Defendant

ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rene A Vazquez

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St.

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Thaddeus McCarty

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Houston

800 Capitol St., 24Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Rex Andrew Mann

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2501 North Harwood Street, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/14/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rex Andrew Mann on behalf of ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. (Mann, Rex) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Thaddeus McCarty on behalf of ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. (McCarty, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Vazquez, Rene) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Vazquez, Rene) Modified on 5/17/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Vazquez, Rene) Modified on 5/17/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ZIM Integrated Shipping Services, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8328679.), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zim Integrated Shipping Services Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rene A Vazquez