This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 06:37:00 (UTC).

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC v. Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC

Defendant

Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rene A Vazquez

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St.

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Noel Franco Chakkalakal

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8875308.), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing waiver sent on 4/14/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noel Franco Chakkalakal on behalf of Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing (Chakkalakal, Noel) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all pending claims and causes of action in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/26/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all pending claims and causes of action in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/26/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noel Franco Chakkalakal on behalf of Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing (Chakkalakal, Noel) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing waiver sent on 4/14/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8875308.), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noel F. Chakkalakal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay