This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 09:25:29 (UTC).

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC v. Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC

Defendant

Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randall T Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St.

Tyler, TX 75702

Rene A Vazquez

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St.

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Blake Thompson

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

201 E. Howard Street

Henderson, TX 75654

James Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

201 E. Howard Street

Henderson, TX 75654

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. (Mann, James) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC.( Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#5

(#5) FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC.( Vazquez, Rene) Modified on 3/3/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. c/o OOCL (USA) Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8221951.), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. (Mann, James) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. to 4/3/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC.( Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel advised to refile with defendant name. Document # 5, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC.( Vazquez, Rene) Modified on 3/3/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. c/o OOCL (USA) Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Orient Overseas Container Line Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8221951.), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rene A Vazquez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Garteiser