This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 12:58:14 (UTC).

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC v. Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hapag-Lloyd America LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01195

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC

Defendants

Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC

Hapag-Lloyd AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. Scott Fuller

Attorney at Garteiser Honea

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75702

Randall T. Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St

Tyler, TX 75702

Thomas G. Fasone, III

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75207

Defendant Attorney

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 50000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC, Hapag-Lloyd AG. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC. (bw) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14326737), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC, Hapag-Lloyd AG. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC. (bw) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14326737), filed by Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transcend Shipping Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HAPAG LLOYD (AMERICA), INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas G Fasone, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Garteiser