This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2022 at 09:42:58 (UTC).

Tranquility IP LLC v. ADTRAN, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 Tranquility IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ADTRAN, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tranquility IP LLC

Defendant

ADTRAN, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

David R. Bennett

Defendant Attorneys

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Related Cases

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8272037. (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tranquility IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tranquility IP LLC. ADTRAN, Inc. served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to complaint to June 20, 2022 - filed by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to complaint to June 20, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: ADTRAN, Inc. answer due 6/20/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/8/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to complaint to June 20, 2022 - filed by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Tranquility IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Tranquility IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/7/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Tranquility IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tranquility IP LLC. ADTRAN, Inc. served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tranquility IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8272037. (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Tranquility IP LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3831868.) - filed by Tranquility IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adtran Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANQUILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney