This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2020 at 07:38:16 (UTC).

Tran v. Topcon Healthcare Solutions INC.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Tran filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Topcon Healthcare Solutions INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04638

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Tran

Defendant

topcon healthcare solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neama Rahmani

Attorney at West Coast Trial Lawyers, APLC

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3325

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Ronald Leonardo Zambrano

Attorney at WEST COAST TRIAL LAWYERS, APLC

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3350

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Amber M. Spataro

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

One Newark Center, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Jonathan Alexander Heller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

50 W. San Fernando St., 7Th Fl.

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/27/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steve Tran.. (Zambrano, Ronald) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by topcon healthcare solutions (Heller, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber M. Spataro (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Spataro, Amber) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by topcon healthcare solutions identifying Corporate Parent Topcon Corporation, Corporate Parent Topcon America Corporation for topcon healthcare solutions. (Heller, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

1 #4

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20063957. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14683782). Filed bytopcon healthcare solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Heller, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/27/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steve Tran.. (Zambrano, Ronald) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by topcon healthcare solutions (Heller, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber M. Spataro (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Spataro, Amber) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by topcon healthcare solutions identifying Corporate Parent Topcon Corporation, Corporate Parent Topcon America Corporation for topcon healthcare solutions. (Heller, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20063957. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14683782). Filed bytopcon healthcare solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Heller, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber M. Spataro