This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 09:34:26 (UTC).

Tran v. Fiesta Mart, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Tran filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fiesta Mart, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02159

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Tran

Defendant

Fiesta Mart, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John K Zaid

Attorney at John K Zaid Asoc PLLC

16951 Feather Craft Ln

Houston, TX 77058

Ryan Edward Bill

Attorney at John K. Zaid & Associates

16951 Feather Craft Ln

Houston, TX 77058

Defendant Attorney

Maryalyce Walsh Cox

Attorney at Mehaffy Weber PC

One Allen Center, 500 Dallas St., Ste. 2800

Houston, TX 77704

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fiesta Mart, LLC, filed.(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#4

(#4) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Fiesta Mart, LLC, filed.(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Phillip Tran, filed.(Bill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

2 #1

Supplement

#2

(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 11:30 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provide for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125TH DISTRICT COURT HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS, case number 2021-32472 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26688433) filed by Fiesta Mart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fiesta Mart, LLC, filed.(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Fiesta Mart, LLC, filed.(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Phillip Tran, filed.(Bill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 11:30 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provide for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125TH DISTRICT COURT HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS, case number 2021-32472 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26688433) filed by Fiesta Mart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiesta Mart, L.L.C. is a litigant