This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 09:55:00 (UTC).

Tran San v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Tran San filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02733

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tran San

Garden Grove, CA 92843

Defendants

Cal Western Reconveyance Corporation

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy E Shulman

Attorney at Anglin Flewelling and Rasmussen LLP

301 North Lake Avenue, Suite 1100

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On April 1, 2021, the Court issued an order provisionally remanding this action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court as a result of a procedural defect in the Notice of Removal. The Court stayed the order remanding the action to provide plaintiff with an opportunity to object to the remand and waive the procedural defect. Specifically, plaintiff was directed to inform the Court in writing by April 12, 2021, if plaintiff objected to the remand. To date, despite the passage of the deadline set by the Court, plaintiff has not waived the procedural defect. Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the Court's April 1, 2021 Order, this action is remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV06070. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (mrgo) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, re Transfer Pursuant to GO 21-01 DECLINED- (related case)(CV-34) #7 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #11 , Order #8 , Order #9 , Order, Set/Reset Hearing #10 served on April 5, 2021. (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because this case was not originally removable under 1446(b)(1), the one year limitation on removal applies to this case. Accordingly, Removing Defendant's Notice of Removal is not timely under 1446(c)(1). The Court therefore concludes that the Notice of Removal is procedurally defective. See 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(1). Accordingly, this action is remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV06070. The Court stays this order until April 12, 2021. If Plaintiff wishes to waive the procedural defect and, as a result, remain in federal court, he must file a Notice of Waiver of Procedural Defect no later than April 12, 2021. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#8

(#8) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:15-cv-08870 ODW(KSx) (rn) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-08870-ODW and 2:18-cv-02331-ODW (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, identifying Wells Fargo & Co.; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A. f/k/a Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, f/k/a World Savings Bank, FSB. (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On April 1, 2021, the Court issued an order provisionally remanding this action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court as a result of a procedural defect in the Notice of Removal. The Court stayed the order remanding the action to provide plaintiff with an opportunity to object to the remand and waive the procedural defect. Specifically, plaintiff was directed to inform the Court in writing by April 12, 2021, if plaintiff objected to the remand. To date, despite the passage of the deadline set by the Court, plaintiff has not waived the procedural defect. Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the Court's April 1, 2021 Order, this action is remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV06070. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (mrgo) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, re Transfer Pursuant to GO 21-01 DECLINED- (related case)(CV-34) #7 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #11 , Order #8 , Order #9 , Order, Set/Reset Hearing #10 served on April 5, 2021. (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because this case was not originally removable under 1446(b)(1), the one year limitation on removal applies to this case. Accordingly, Removing Defendant's Notice of Removal is not timely under 1446(c)(1). The Court therefore concludes that the Notice of Removal is procedurally defective. See 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(1). Accordingly, this action is remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV06070. The Court stays this order until April 12, 2021. If Plaintiff wishes to waive the procedural defect and, as a result, remain in federal court, he must file a Notice of Waiver of Procedural Defect no later than April 12, 2021. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:15-cv-08870 ODW(KSx) (rn) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Tran San in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/18/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-08870-ODW and 2:18-cv-02331-ODW (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, identifying Wells Fargo & Co.; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A. f/k/a Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, f/k/a World Savings Bank, FSB. (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV06070 Receipt No: ACACDC-31011683 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint) (Attorney Jeremy E Shulman added to party Wells Fargo Bank NA(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy E Shulman added to party Wells Fargo Home Mortgage(pty:dft))(Shulman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy E Shulman