This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:37:58 (UTC).

Trajkovski Invest AB et al v. I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Trajkovski Invest AB filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against I Am Plus Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Johan Kjell

Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation

LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation

LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation

Christian Ask

Jimmie Landerman,

Martin Bengtsson

Jussi Ax

Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation

Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation

Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation

OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation

Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation

Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation

Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation

CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation

Christian Mnsson

Christian Mansson

Defendant

I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc. a Delaware corporation

Respondent

I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Stefan Bogdanovich

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West 5Th Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Malcolm S McNeil

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West Fifth Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1065

Respondent Attorneys

Shamar Jastin Toms-Anthony

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle and Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Erin E McCracken

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle and Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90037-5717

Ryan Matthew Salzman

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle and Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1504

 

Court Documents

#45

RESTRICTED

#44

(#44) ORDER GRANTING SECOND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 79-5.2.2(a)(ii) #42 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

42 #2

Redacted Document Redacted Reply in Support of Motion

42 #1

Proposed Order

#42

(#42) APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Redacted Reply in Support of Motion)(Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

(#45) SEALED REPLY RE Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #44 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 #19 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation.(Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

1 #8

Declaration of Thorbjorn Wennerholm ISO Petition

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (lc) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#46) The hearing on the MOTION FOR RECOGNITION[19,23], scheduled for March 2, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) SEALED REPLY RE Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #44 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #18 #19 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation.(Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER GRANTING SECOND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO L.R. 79-5.2.2(a)(ii) #42 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #42 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Motion)(Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Redacted Reply in Support of Motion)(Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition Re Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,, #40 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Answer, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(McCracken, Erin) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #35 #38 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby GRANTS the Application to file the following documents under seal: 1. The unredacted version of Respondents Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award. 2. The unredacted version of Respondents Answer to Petitioners' Petition. 3. The unredacted version of the Declaration of Erin E. McCracken in Support of Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award and Exhibit B thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #38 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Unredacted Document Answer, #3 Unredacted Document Declaration, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration)(McCracken, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition, #2 Redacted Document Answer, #3 Redacted Document Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Application)(McCracken, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re APPLICATION to file document in Opposition to Motion for Recognition of Foreign Arbitral Award under seal #35 filed by Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (McCracken, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent I.Am.Plus Electronics, Inc.. (lc) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Petitioners Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mansson, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mnsson, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation. (Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Christian Mnsson, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, identifying N/A. (Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christian Ask, Jussi Ax, Martin Bengtsson, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Petitioner Christian Mnsson. (Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Award Under 9 U.S.C. Section 207 Receipt No: 0973-25068250 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation, Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation, Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Martin Bengtsson, Christian Mnsson, Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation, Johan Kjell, LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation, Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation, Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation, Jimmie Landerman,, CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation, Jussi Ax, Christian Ask. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Declaration of Thorbjorn Wennerholm ISO Petition) (Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Christian Ask(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Jussi Ax(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Martin Bengtsson(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party CapMate Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Expassum Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Granitor Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Johan Kjell(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party LMK Forward AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party LUSAM Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Jimmie Landerman,(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Linden Invent AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Midroc Finans AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Christian Mnsson(pty:pet), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Muirfield Ventures AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party OPK Holding AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Rasunda Forvaltning Aktiebolag, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Trajkovski Invest AB, a Swedish Corporation(pty:pla))(Bogdanovich, Stefan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less