This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 08:18:31 (UTC).

Trainor v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Trainor filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Delta Air Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11310

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zenaida Trainor

Defendant

Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Scott R. Torpey

Attorney at Jaffe, Raitt,

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfield, MI 48034-8214

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - Montreal Convention

1 #4

Exhibit C - Convention for the Unification of Certain Rules for International Ca

1 #5

Exhibit D - Weiss v. El Al Israel Airlines, Ltd., 433 F. Supp. 2d 361 (S.D.N.Y.

1 #6

Exhibit E - Matz v. Northwest Airlines, 2008 WL 2064800 (E.D. Mich. May 13, 2008

1 #7

Exhibit F - Garrisi v. Northwest Airlines, Inc., 2010 WL 34702374 (E.D. Mich. Se

1 #8

Exhibit G - Knowlton v. American Airlines, Inc., 2007 WL 273794 (D. Md. Jan. 31,

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from 12th Judicial District Court for Jackson County, case number 22-0722-GCG. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8944770 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Montreal Convention, #4 Exhibit C - Convention for the Unification of Certain Rules for International Carriage by Air Done at Montreal on 28 May 1999 (excerpted), #5 Exhibit D - Weiss v. El Al Israel Airlines, Ltd., 433 F. Supp. 2d 361 (S.D.N.Y. 2006), #6 Exhibit E - Matz v. Northwest Airlines, 2008 WL 2064800 (E.D. Mich. May 13, 2008), #7 Exhibit F - Garrisi v. Northwest Airlines, Inc., 2010 WL 34702374 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 16, 2010), #8 Exhibit G - Knowlton v. American Airlines, Inc., 2007 WL 273794 (D. Md. Jan. 31, 2007)) (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R Torpey