This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 08:21:43 (UTC).

Trahan v. Diamondback Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 Trahan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Diamondback Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David Counts and Ronald C. Griffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00207

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Trahan

Defendant

Diamondback Energy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Richard Burch

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Lindsay R. Itkin

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard M. Schreiber

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bryan Trahan. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/23/2022) (kg). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Diamondback Energy, Inc.. (kg) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Bryan Trahan. Attorney Richard M. Schreiber added to party Bryan Trahan(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Bryan Trahan (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Trahan. Diamondback Energy, Inc. served on 10/18/2022, answer due 11/8/2022. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Trahan. Diamondback Energy, Inc. served on 10/18/2022, answer due 11/8/2022. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Bryan Trahan (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Bryan Trahan. Attorney Richard M. Schreiber added to party Bryan Trahan(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Diamondback Energy, Inc.. (kg) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kg) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bryan Trahan. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/23/2022) (kg). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16561343), filed by Bryan Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/23/2022) (kg). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diamondback Energy, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindsay R. Itkin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Jennings Burch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew W. Dunlap