This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 08:15:00 (UTC).

Trafelet v. Cipolla & Co. LLC.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Trafelet filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Cipolla Co LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04888

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC

Petitioner

Lara S. Trafelet

Defendant

DEF

Respondent

Cipolla & Co. LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jenna Elizabeth Ross

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Stephen Louis Ascher

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Respondent Attorneys

David Norton Mair

Attorney at Kaiser Saurborn & Mair PC

30 Broad Street, Ste 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Henry Lee Saurborn, Jr

Attorney at Kaiser Saurborn & Mair, P.C.

111 Broadway, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER terminating #7 Motion to Vacate Arbitration; terminating #12 Motion to Vacate Arbitration; granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 7, 12, and 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/5/22) (yv) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Lee Saurborn, Jr on behalf of Cipolla & Co. LLC...(Saurborn, Henry) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Norton Mair on behalf of Cipolla & Co. LLC...(Mair, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

20 #1

Exhibit A

20 #20

Main Document

19 #1

Exhibit A

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Exhibit A

18 #18

Main Document

#16

(#16) ORDER: Petitioner has filed a motion to vacate an arbitration award. ECF Nos. 7, 12. Proceedings to vacate or modify an arbitration award are treated "akin to a motion for summary judgment." D.H. Blair & Co., Inc. v. Gottdiener, 462 F.3d 95, 109 (2d Cir. 2006). Accordingly, By July 5, 2022, Petitioner shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1, with citations to the additional materials filed to support the petition; By July 26, 2022, Respondent shall file its opposition; and, By August 9, 2022, Petitioner shall file her reply, if any. Petitioner is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Respondent through personal service, process service, or through counsel by July 1, 2022, and to file proof of service on the docket by July 5, 2022. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 7/5/2022., Responses due by 7/26/2022, Replies due by 8/9/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/28/2022) (ama) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#12

(#14) DECLARATION of Erik S. Groothuis in Support re: #12 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration .. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46).(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#11

(#11) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION..Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet..(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER terminating #7 Motion to Vacate Arbitration; terminating #12 Motion to Vacate Arbitration; granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 7, 12, and 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/5/22) (yv) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Lee Saurborn, Jr on behalf of Cipolla & Co. LLC...(Saurborn, Henry) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Norton Mair on behalf of Cipolla & Co. LLC...(Mair, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stephen Ascher dated June 29, 2022. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order ECF No. #16 served on Cipolla & Co., LLC on 6/28/2022. Service was accepted by David N. Mair, Respondent's Counsel. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Sealing Order served on Cipolla & Co., LLC on 6/23/2022. Service was accepted by David N. Mair, Respondent's Counsel. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cipolla & Co. LLC. served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service was accepted by Kallie Knebl and David Mair. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Petitioner has filed a motion to vacate an arbitration award. ECF Nos. 7, 12. Proceedings to vacate or modify an arbitration award are treated "akin to a motion for summary judgment." D.H. Blair & Co., Inc. v. Gottdiener, 462 F.3d 95, 109 (2d Cir. 2006). Accordingly, By July 5, 2022, Petitioner shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1, with citations to the additional materials filed to support the petition; By July 26, 2022, Respondent shall file its opposition; and, By August 9, 2022, Petitioner shall file her reply, if any. Petitioner is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Respondent through personal service, process service, or through counsel by July 1, 2022, and to file proof of service on the docket by July 5, 2022. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 7/5/2022., Responses due by 7/26/2022, Replies due by 8/9/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/28/2022) (ama) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Erik S. Groothuis / Sealed Exhibits in Support re: #12 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration ., #14 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet, Cipolla & Co. LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 27, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 38)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 3 .(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Erik S. Groothuis in Support re: #12 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration .. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46).(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION..Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet..(Ascher, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docket(#10) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION ERIK S. GROOTHUIS AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AN ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 3 .. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3***(js) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 3 . ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3***(js) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 3 . ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3***(js) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cipolla & Co. LLC. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 3 . ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3***(js) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD;Document filed by Lara S. Trafelet. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3***.(js) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3***.(js) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (nmo) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry L. Saurborn, Jr.