This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 08:41:17 (UTC).

Trader v. SeatGeek, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Trader filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SeatGeek, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03248

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Trader

Dustin Snyder

Lindsey Anderson

Defendant

SeatGeek, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Alexander Coulson

Attorney at Liddle & Dubin, PC

975 E. Jefferson Avenue

Detroit, MI 48207

Steven Liddle

Attorney at LIDDLE & DUBIN, P.C

975 E. Jefferson Ave.

Detroit, MI 48207

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint submissions are due by September 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/9/2020) Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ks) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#14

(#14) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicholas A. Coulson dated June 9, 2020. Document filed by Lindsey Anderson, Dustin Snyder..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#13

(#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against SeatGeek, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dustin Snyder, Lindsey Anderson. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Liddle on behalf of William Trader..(Liddle, Steven) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Alexander Coulson on behalf of William Trader..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #9 Motion for Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/5/2020) (js) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19692829. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Trader..(Liddle, Steven) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#8

(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Nicholas Alexander Coulson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19577875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SeatGeek, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Trader..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Coulson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship Plaintiff and Citizenship Defendant codes - no selection; Courthouse Assignment code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#1

(#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against SeatGeek, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dustin Snyder, Lindsey Anderson. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint submissions are due by September 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/9/2020) Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ks) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicholas A. Coulson dated June 9, 2020. Document filed by Lindsey Anderson, Dustin Snyder..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against SeatGeek, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dustin Snyder, Lindsey Anderson. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Liddle on behalf of William Trader..(Liddle, Steven) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Alexander Coulson on behalf of William Trader..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #9 Motion for Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/5/2020) (js) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19692829. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19692829. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Trader..(Liddle, Steven) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ama) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Coulson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Trader; SeatGeek, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Coulson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $9999000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5000000;. (jgo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Coulson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship Plaintiff and Citizenship Defendant codes - no selection; Courthouse Assignment code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Nicholas Alexander Coulson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19577875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Nicholas Alexander Coulson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19577875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Trader..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SeatGeek, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Trader..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Coulson, Nicholas) Modified on 4/27/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SeatGeek, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19577163)Document filed by William Trader..(Coulson, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less