This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 08:55:21 (UTC).

Tracy v. Elekta, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Tracy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Elekta, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02851

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carla Tracy

Defendant

Elekta, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan L. Bleichner

Attorney at Chestnut Cambronne PA

100 Washington Avenue South

Minneapolis, MN 55401

David K. Lietz

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

5101 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 305

Washington, DC 20016

Gary M. Klinger

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

MaryBeth Vassil Gibson

Attorney at The Finley Firm, P.C.

Building 14, Suite 230, 3535 Piedmont Road

Atlanta, GA 30305

Nathan D. Prosser

Attorney at Hellmuth & Johnson PLLC -MN

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Terence R. Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road

Cincinnati, OH 45209

N. Nickolas Jackson

Attorney at The Finley Firm, P.C.

200 13Th Street

Columbus, GA 31901

Defendant Attorneys

Cameron Blaine Roberts

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael A. Caplan

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Elekta, Inc. Answer due 10/29/2021. If Elekta files a motion to dismiss, then Plaintiff's response brief will be due on December 13, 2021, and Elekta's reply brief will be due on January 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/08/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#25

(#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Elekta, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Elekta, Inc. Answer due 9/30/2021. If Elekta files a motion to dismiss, then Plaintiff's response brief will be due on November 15, 2021, and Elekta's reply brief will be due on December 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/10/2021. (jkb) Modified on 8/11/2021 to edit text(jkb). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#23

(#23) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elekta, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ELEKTA AB, Corporate Parent Elekta Holdings U.S., Inc. for Elekta, Inc.. (Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#24) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Elekta, Inc. Answer due 9/30/2021. If Elekta files a motion to dismiss, then Plaintiff's response brief will be due on November 15, 2021, and Elekta's reply brief will be due on December 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/10/2021. (jkb) Modified on 8/11/2021 to edit text(jkb). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons , as to Defendant. (Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Elekta, Inc. (ceo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carla Tracy. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11112156) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Elekta, Inc. Answer due 10/29/2021. If Elekta files a motion to dismiss, then Plaintiff's response brief will be due on December 13, 2021, and Elekta's reply brief will be due on January 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/08/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Elekta, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan D. Prosser. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 16, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terrence R. Coates. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 16, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan D. Prosser Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Nathan D. Prosser added appearing on behalf of Carla Tracy (nmb) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Terrence R. Coates Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Terence R. Coates added appearing on behalf of Carla Tracy (nmb) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Elekta, Inc. Answer due 9/30/2021. If Elekta files a motion to dismiss, then Plaintiff's response brief will be due on November 15, 2021, and Elekta's reply brief will be due on December 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/10/2021. (jkb) Modified on 8/11/2021 to edit text(jkb). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elekta, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ELEKTA AB, Corporate Parent Elekta Holdings U.S., Inc. for Elekta, Inc.. (Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Nathan D. Prosser (Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Gary M. Klinger (Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Bryan L. Bleichner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11138418). to attorney for correction re: Missing Signatures. (nmb) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan D. Prosser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11153124).by Carla Tracy. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Terence R. Coates Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11153108).by Carla Tracy. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Gary M. Klinger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11148775).by Carla Tracy. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of David K. Lietz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11148738).by Carla Tracy. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons , as to Defendant. (Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Bryan L. Bleichner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11138418).by Carla Tracy. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Gibson, MaryBeth) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Elekta, Inc. (ceo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carla Tracy. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11112156) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elekta Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Caplan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron B. Roberts