This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 10:07:21 (UTC).

TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc v. ICAP Enterprises Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against ICAP Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michelle L. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00539

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michelle L. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc

Defendants

ICAP Enterprises Inc

Harbor Platform Inc

Hafen, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeanne Hamburg

Attorney at NORRIS MCLAUGHLIN & MARCUS PA

7 Times Square 21St Fl

New York, NY 10036

Brian William Esler

Attorney at MILLER NASH LLP (SEA)

2801 Alaskan Way, Ste 300 Pier 70

Seattle, WA 98121-1128

David H Siegel

Attorney at NORRIS MCLAUGHLIN & MARCUS PA

7 Times Square 21St Fl

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina Danielson

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (CO)

1900 Sixteenth St Ste 1400

Denver, CO 80202

William C Rava

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

20 #1

Exhibit A

#20

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

#18

#17

#16

1 #10

Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/18/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER OF DEFAULT signed by Clerk William M McCool, re: #19 Motion for Default. (TF) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Brian W. Esler filed by Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc re #19 MOTION for Default against Hafen, LLC dba Harbor, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Esler, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Default against Hafen, LLC dba Harbor,, filed by Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/9/2021, (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Brian William Esler. Filed by Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc. (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hafen, LLC dba Harbor on 5/13/2021, filed by Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc. (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hafen, LLC. (TF) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Esler, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sabrina Danielson for Defendant ICAP Enterprises Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant ICAP Enterprises Inc mailed on 4/23/2021 (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketHon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (SG) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David H Siegel for Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeanne Hamburg for Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David H. Siegel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7053463 (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeanne M. Hamburg FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7053420 (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent TP ICAP Group plc for TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc (Esler, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7052823) Attorney Brian William Esler added to party TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc(pty:pla), filed by TP ICAP Americas Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Esler, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian William Esler